CO HB1089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter Schools Grant Applications
Title
Charter Schools Grant Applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.008 (Attachment F). The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1089 to the Committee on Education (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-14 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Education | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Education | |
2011-02-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-31 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |