CO HB1089 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
10th Mountain Division License Plate Qualification
Title
10th Mountain Division License Plate Qualification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, unamended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment line 13, strike "RENW" and substitute "RENEW" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment line 13, strike "RENW" and substitute "RENEW" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, unamended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment line 13, strike "RENW" and substitute "RENEW" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment line 13, strike "RENW" and substitute "RENEW" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 5/2/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/28/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/7/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-26 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations |