CO HB1089 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that transportation network companies provide insurance to protect individuals from damages caused by uninsured motorists.
Title
Rideshares And Uninsured Motorist Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2022-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |