CO HB1104 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CO Cancer Fund Tax Checkoff Name Change
Title
CO Cancer Fund Tax Checkoff Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend page 4, line 5, strike "January 1, 2020 JANUARY 1, 2017," and substitute "January 1, 2020," and page 5, line 4, strike "January 1, 2021 JANUARY 1, 2018," and substitute "January 1, 2021,". The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend page 4, line 5, strike "January 1, 2020 JANUARY 1, 2017," and substitute "January 1, 2020," and page 5, line 4, strike "January 1, 2021 JANUARY 1, 2018," and substitute "January 1, 2021,". The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend page 4, line 5, strike "January 1, 2020 JANUARY 1, 2017," and substitute "January 1, 2020," and page 5, line 4, strike "January 1, 2021 JANUARY 1, 2018," and substitute "January 1, 2021,". The amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-01 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |