CO HB1131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Release Critical Incident Information Juvenile
Title
Release Critical Incident Information Juvenile
Sponsors
Rep. Daneya Esgar [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Kent Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |