CO HB1138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reporting of hate crimes by law enforcement agencies.
Title
Hate Crime Reporting By Law Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |