CO HB1138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supplementing the centralized inventory of state-owned real property maintained by the office of the state architect to include all publicly owned real property.
Title
Public Real Property Index
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Pursuant to House Rule 50, favorably recommend House Bill 20-1138 to the House Transportation and Local Government Committee. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Pursuant to House Rule 50, favorably recommend House Bill 20-1138 to the House Transportation and Local Government Committee. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Appropriations |