CO HB1197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the department of public safety.
Title
Department of Public Safety Supplemental
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1197 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1197 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1197 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 19 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1197 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Governor Signed | |
2024-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |