CO HB1204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Regulation Hemodialysis Technicians
Title
Sunset Regulation Hemodialysis Technicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1204 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-27 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-24 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |