CO HB1204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile delinquency record expungement, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Juvenile Delinquency Record Expungement
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1204 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Amend proposed amendment L.030, page 3, lines 22-23, strike "If the records are eligible for expungement pursuant to subsection (5) of this section," and page 4, line 5, strike "17" and substitute "24". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.030 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.029 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment Q). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment P). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Amend proposed amendment L.030, page 3, lines 22-23, strike "If the records are eligible for expungement pursuant to subsection (5) of this section," and page 4, line 5, strike "17" and substitute "24". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.030 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.029 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment Q). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment P). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |