CO HB1228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning oversight of court personnel who are regularly involved in cases related to domestic matters, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Domestic Violence Training Court Personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1228 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1228 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |