CO HB1232 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Warrior Transition Battalion Fishing Licenses
Title
Warrior Transition Battalion Fishing Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to include any veteran who has been injured in the line of duty or is in rehabilitation from their service to be included in the free licensing program (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to include any veteran who has been injured in the line of duty or is in rehabilitation from their service to be included in the free licensing program (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to include any veteran who has been injured in the line of duty or is in rehabilitation from their service to be included in the free licensing program (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to include any veteran who has been injured in the line of duty or is in rehabilitation from their service to be included in the free licensing program (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2013-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |