CO HB1232 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset DOR Private Letter Ruling & Gen Info Letter
Title
Sunset DOR Private Letter Ruling & Gen Info Letter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1232 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-04 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-03 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |