CO HB1232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of persons in connection with the control of asbestos, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the department of regulatory agencies contained in the 2021 sunset report.
Title
Sunset Continue Regulation Of Asbestos
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1232 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |