CO HB1235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of custom meat processors, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the 2017 sunset report of the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Custom Meat Processing
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Hansen [D] | Rep. Hugh McKean [R] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |