CO HB1235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of veterinary practice by the state board of veterinary medicine, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the 2021 sunset report on the "Colorado Veterinary Practice Act" by the department of regulatory agencies, adding registration requirements for veterinary technicians, adding veterinary technicians to the state board of veterinary medicine, allowing certain unlicensed individuals to administer rabies vaccinations, and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Continue Regulation Of Veterinary Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1235 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1235, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |