CO HB1248 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the "Uniform Non-Testamentary Electronic Estate Planning Documents Act".
Title
Non-Testamentary Electronic Estate Planning Docs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |