CO HB1258 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating a task force to study the costs associated with drug crimes, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Drug Crime Cost Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Recede (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Recede (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Adhere (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2023-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-11 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |