CO HB1267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by educational agencies to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Education Agencies To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |