CO HB1267 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increased penalties for speeding violations on highways with steep downhill grades, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Double Fines Speeding Trucks On Steep Grades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1267 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1267 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1267 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1267 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-11 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |