CO HB1275 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Idling Commercial Diesel Vehicles
Title
Idling Commercial Diesel Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended by prepared amendment L.008, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended by prepared amendment L.008, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended by prepared amendment L.008, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended by prepared amendment L.008, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended by prepared amendment L.008, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-05 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation | |
2011-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-24 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |