CO HB1275 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Career & Tech Ed In Concurrent Enrollment
Title
Career & Tech Ed In Concurrent Enrollment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1275 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2015-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |