CO HB1292 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibitions on certain firearms used in public mass shootings.
Title
Prohibit Certain Weapons Used in Mass Shootings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 24-1292 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.010) (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.009) (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.005) (Y: 21 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.010) (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.009) (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.005) (Y: 21 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 22 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole Amendment - Change from Passed to Lost |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |