CO HB1309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-18)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-18)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection for persons assisting in volunteer helicopter search and rescue operations.
Title
Use of Aircraft in Search and Rescue Operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1309 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1309 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1309, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |