CO HB1319 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local Inspectors For School Plumbing & Electric
Title
Local Inspectors For School Plumbing & Electric
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Keith King [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of a reverse roll call, therefore, the motion to postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1319 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1319 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of a reverse roll call, therefore, the motion to postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-1319, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-1319, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1319 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1319 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of a reverse roll call, therefore, the motion to postpone House Bill 12-1319 indefinitely passed on a vote of 3-2. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-1319, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-1319, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2012-05-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-23 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-20 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-04 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-12 | House Committee on Local Government Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |