CO HB1327 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of physical therapy practice, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2023 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |