CO HB1343 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning confinement standards for egg-laying hens whose eggs are sold.
Title
Egg-laying Hen Confinement Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1343 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1343 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1343, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |