CO HB1378 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court To Collect And Transfer Costs Of DUI Tests
Title
Court To Collect And Transfer Costs Of DUI Tests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1378, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-05 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |