CO HB1385 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Definition Child Abuse Substance Exposure
Title
Definition Child Abuse Substance Exposure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1385 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1385 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) to amend L.001 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H), to amend L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) to amend L.001 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H), to amend L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1385 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1385 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) to amend L.001 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H), to amend L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C), as amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) to amend L.001 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D), to amend L.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H), to amend L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1385, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2016-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-26 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |