CO HB1391 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Instacheck Firearm Transfer
Title
Sunset Instacheck Firearm Transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Boyd [D] | Rep. Joe Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that House Bill 10-1391 be favorably recommended to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1391 to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1391 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee continued to comment about the bill (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1391 to the Committee on State, Veterans, and Military Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1391 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee continued to comment about the bill (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-03 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-30 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |