CO HB1391 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
PERA & Denver Pub Sch 5 Year True-up
Title
PERA & Denver Pub Sch 5 Year True-up
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1391 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1391 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1391 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |