CO HB1391 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Immigration Consultants Deceptive Trade Practice
Title
Immigration Consultants Deceptive Trade Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1391 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1391 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1391 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1391 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |