CO HJR1004 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-18)
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-18)
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the commemoration of the birthday of the Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Title
Commemorate Dr. Martin Luther King Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2024-01-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-01-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |