CO HJR1006 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Military Day
Title
Military Day
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2013-01-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2013-01-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E34D71D578E3D387257AF50002DA1A?Open |