CO HJR1015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Summary
Approve School Of Mines Performance Contract
Title
Approve School Of Mines Performance Contract
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A599FBE9110F9DC687257B1F007AE147?Open |