CO SB020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for certain persons licensed to sell alcohol beverages at retail to sell alcohol beverages for consumption off the licensed premises.
Title
Alcohol Beverage Delivery & Takeout
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-020 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |