CO SB064 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Institutions Apply For COF For Students
Title
Institutions Apply For COF For Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-064 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended recommendation to be placed on consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-064 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-064 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended recommendation to be placed on consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-064 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee on Education Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |