CO SB073 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Permits Stormwater Rule-making
Title
General Permits Stormwater Rule-making
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |