CO SB184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a new permit for the short-term extraction of construction materials.
Title
Permit Short-term Extraction Construction Material
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-184 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-184 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |