CO SB221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the minimum age of motorboat operators.
Title
Minimum Age Of Motorboat Operators
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Coram [R] | Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D] | Rep. Julie McCluskie [D] | Sen. Perry Will [R] |
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |