CO SB224 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mechanisms to manage technology life-cycle costs.
Title
Mitigate Future State Technology Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |