CO SB233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of law to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Department Of Law To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-233 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |