CT HB05159 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 231
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 231
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Developmental Services regarding oversight of emergency medical care and end-of-life planning.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Department Of Developmental Services Regarding Oversight Of Emergency Medical Care And End-of-life Planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 231 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 164 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |