CT HB05162 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Children and Families, Department of Social Services and Department of Developmental Services to submit reports describing current costs associated with programs serving children and families and anticipated costs associated with utilizing different eligibility criteria for participation in such programs.
Title
An Act Requiring Certain Agencies To Report Costs Associated With Programs Serving Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-12 | House | File Number 2 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Calendar Number 29 |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |