CT HB05203 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit automobile insurance identification cards to be provided electronically for motor vehicle traffic stops and registration of motor vehicles with the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning Electronic Proof Of Automobile Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 363 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-108 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate Calendar Number 474 |
2018-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 144 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 115 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |