CT HB05261 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - File Number 621
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - File Number 621
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the sale of energy drinks to individuals under sixteen years of age.
Title
An Act Concerning The Consumption Of Energy Drinks By Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 56 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 55 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 56 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 55 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | File Number 621 |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 377 |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B,D |
2024-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 4580 |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 4383 |
2024-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4250 |
2024-04-25 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 4128 |
2024-04-18 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2024-04-18 | House | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 4128 |
2024-03-14 | House | File Number 37 |
2024-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 58 |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |