CT HB05296 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to (1) study family home care oversight in the state, (2) compensate family caregivers, including spouses, who provide personal care assistance services in the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly, (3) collect data regarding adult family living services in the state and report on such data, and (4) develop and implement a marketing campaign to promote adult family living services.
Title
An Act Expanding The Connecticut Home-care Program For The Elderly.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Rep. James Sanchez [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Jan Hochadel [D] |
Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | House | File Number 128 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 114 |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |