CT HB05319 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the disclosure of prepayment penalties.
Title
An Act Concerning Disclosure Of Prepayment Penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 166 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 157 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |