CT HB05422 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 412
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 412
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To mandate for any person convicted of a hate or bias crime, participation in an anti-bias or diversity awareness program or in a program of community service designed to remedy damage caused by the commission of a bias crime or otherwise related to the defendant's violation, adjust the membership of the State-Wide Hate Crimes Advisory Council and require the council to examine and recommend legislative changes to the intent elements of hate crime statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Hate And Bias Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 412 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-11 | House | File Number 456 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 300 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |