CT HB05424 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 332
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 332
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit adverse actions against health care providers for providing certain health care services.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Adverse Actions Against Health Care Providers For Providing Certain Health Care Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 332 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 227 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |